Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain termination provision for the purpose of continuing the exclusion of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund from the list of insurance companies and other persons that are subject to a certain premium tax.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0457
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793695/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {407478/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Economic Matters 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {793695/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 469
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page