Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Bailey, Benson, Carter, Corderman, Elfreth, Folden, Hettleman, Jackson, James, Jennings, King, McCray, McKay, Muse, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the stable funding and support of trauma-informed, high-quality program and services for victims of crime; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to help support certain programs providing services for victims of crime; requiring the Office to consult with certain individuals and organizations regarding the allocation of certain funding; and requiring the Governor to include certain funding in the State budget.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0186
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Referred Appropriations Judiciary
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
4/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
Senate 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {443129/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Referred Appropriations Judiciary 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2023 4/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 3/31/2023 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page