Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Stopped, Standing, or Parked Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a driver to make a certain lane change or to slow the speed of the driver's vehicle with due regard for safety and traffic conditions when approaching from the rear a stopped, standing, or parked vehicle displaying hazard warning lights, road flares, or other caution signals.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0105
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-20)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433625/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Stopped, Standing, or Parked Vehicles
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (111-20) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page