Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and Beidle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; establishing certain duties of member states; authorizing a certain state to charge a certain fee for granting a certain compact privilege; requiring certain occupational therapists or occupational therapy assistants to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0540
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {384539/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text - Chapter - Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page