Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Baltimore County Public Library to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining; authorizing an employee organization seeking certification as the exclusive representative for the bargaining unit of employees to file a petition with the Director indicating this intent; specifying the responsibilities of the library and the certified exclusive representative; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0045
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607870/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {607870/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   23-701 through 23-712 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page