Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Charles County Campus - Transition to Charles County Community College
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Charles County Community College and the Board of Community College Trustees for Charles County by transitioning the College of Southern Maryland Charles County campus to the Charles County Community College; removing Charles County from certain provisions of law relating to the College of Southern Maryland; exempting the Charles County Community College from certain provisions of law for the 2023-2024 academic year; altering the number of members of the Board of Trustees for the College of Southern Maryland; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - College of Southern Maryland - Charles County Campus - Transition to Charles County Community College
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page