Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals by reducing the number of members from 12 to 11; repealing the requirement that the Subcabinet for Children, Youth, and Families appoint a member of the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals; and repealing the requirement that the Board adopt an official seal.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0021
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2022
Legislative Date
1/16/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Senate 1/16/2022 1/16/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {573323/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803721/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Text - Chapter - State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Membership and Official Seal
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page