Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that all proposed acquisition and development projects and any revisions submitted by the Charles County Board of Commissioners under Program Open Space for certain fiscal years be planned to take place in the Waldorf Core Zone; and defining the term "Waldorf Core Zone" as the area in Charles County located south of Mattawoman Creek, west of Maryland Route 5, north of Billingsley Road, and east of Bensville Road.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page