Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that provisions of law prohibiting and penalizing disruptive and threatening behavior on the grounds of, in the classes of, or in the home of an employee of an institution of elementary, secondary, or higher education do not apply to students who commit offenses at the institution they attend or students who commit offenses while participating in or attending a sporting event or other extracurricular program sponsored at that institution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0084
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2021
Legislative Date
10/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted (30-15)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (23-22)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {323826/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {123724/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-25)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953227/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2021 10/13/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Senate 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Favorable 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Ready) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Favorable 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-30) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Favorable Adopted (30-15) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {573027/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (23-22) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {323826/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-29) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {123724/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-25) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Floor Amendment {953227/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28) 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Ways and Means 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page