Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court – Concurrent Jurisdiction – Juvenile Offenses on Military Installations
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the jurisdiction of the juvenile court is concurrent with that of a federal court sitting in the State over certain proceedings involving violations of federal law by a child under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0749
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/16/2022
Legislative Date
11/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2023
Legislative Date
2/15/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2023
Legislative Date
2/15/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2023
Legislative Date
2/23/2023
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2022 11/16/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Court – Concurrent Jurisdiction – Juvenile Offenses on Military Installations
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2023 2/15/2023 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2023 2/15/2023 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Court – Concurrent Jurisdiction – Juvenile Offenses on Military Installations
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2023 2/23/2023 Referred Judiciary 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/17/2023 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page