Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Generating Capacity
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum generating capacity of a community solar energy generating system from 2 megawatts to 5 megawatts.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0440
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Generating Capacity
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Reassigned to Finance 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page