Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship 2030 Commission and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Rosapepe, Hester, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the Apprenticeship and Training Council and consultants to the Council include representation by individuals who are Asian, Black, and Latino; establishing the Apprenticeship 2030 Commission to examine and make recommendations to expand access to apprenticeships to reduce skill shortages in high-demand occupations and provide affordable training for career pathways for young people; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0926 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2022
Legislative Date
10/31/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
4/05/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/24/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/25/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-32)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/24/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2023
Legislative Date
4/24/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2022 10/31/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeships and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments {193128/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship 2030 Commission and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Referred Economic Matters 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2023 4/05/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2023 3/24/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2023 3/25/2023 Third Reading Passed (102-32) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2023 3/24/2023 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2023 4/24/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship 2030 Commission and Representation on the Apprenticeship and Training Council
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/26/2023 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page