Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing Gear - Individuals Under the Age of 16 Years
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual under the age of 16 years to use a certain collapsible trap or net ring when catching or attempting to catch crabs in the waters of the Chesapeake Bay and its tidal tributaries without a recreational crabbing license.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0465
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2022
Legislative Date
9/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing License - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2023
Legislative Date
2/10/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2022 9/16/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing License - Exemption
Senate 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Favorable with Amendments {113525/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Recreational Crabbing Gear - Individuals Under the Age of 16 Years
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2023 2/10/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page