Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the Community Parks and Playgrounds Program to make grants available to Charles County for the construction and maintenance of basketball courts at county parks with baseball fields; and requiring the governing body of Charles County to apply for grants under the Act and use the grant funding for the construction and maintenance of basketball courts at county parks with baseball fields.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0732
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Charles County - Basketball Courts
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page