Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and update standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include the standards in any requirements established for participation in a higher-performance building program in the State; and defining "State building" as one acquired, constructed, or renovated by the State or one for which 50% of the money for acquisition, construction, or renovation came from State funds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0006
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2022
Legislative Date
10/27/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2022 10/27/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Department of General Services – Energy–Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2023)
Senate 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2023 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page