Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer maintenance injectable medications to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide certain coverage for the administering of certain medications by a licensed pharmacist; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/14/2020
Legislative Date
9/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {556081/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/14/2020 9/14/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {744831/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {556081/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page