Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a licensing and regulatory scheme to allow the commercial fishing of blue and flathead catfish in the tidal waters of the State using a finfish trotline.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0386
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2022
Legislative Date
9/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2023
Legislative Date
1/31/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2023
Legislative Date
1/31/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2023
Legislative Date
1/31/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/02/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2022 9/16/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Senate 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2023 1/31/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/31/2023 1/31/2023 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2023 1/31/2023 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Senate 2/02/2023 2/02/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/6/2023 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page