Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Hough, and Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a special election be held at the same time as the regular statewide primary and general elections that are held in the second year of the term to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly if the vacancy occurs on or before the date that is 55 days before the deadline for filing certificates of candidacy for the regular statewide election.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0006 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/05/2021
Legislative Date
8/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/05/2021 8/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723220/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page