Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Hettleman, Lee, Smith, Watson, and West
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is the victim of an act that would constitute a violation of certain hate crime laws may bring a civil action against the person or persons who committed the act in a court of competent jurisdiction if the person is a victim of the act and suffered certain harm from the act; authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award certain economic and noneconomic damages; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0290
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0128 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Cassilly)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Cassilly)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Davis and Williams)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Davis and Williams)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {503227/1
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {143523/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Judiciary 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253920/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Cassilly) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Waldstreicher and Cassilly) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Refuses Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Davis and Williams) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Refuses Recede 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crutchfield, Davis and Williams) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Conference Committee Report {503227/1 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-309 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page