Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the list of crimes included within a certain definition of "crime of violence" to include sexual abuse of a minor if the offender is at least 21 years old and the victim is under the age of 16 years; and requiring a sentence for certain persons convicted of certain sexual abuse crimes to include a term of lifetime sexual offender supervision.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2021
Legislative Date
9/08/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2021 9/08/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Favorable Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Senate 2/14/2022 2/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 23AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Judiciary 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Age
Last Updated: 4/9/2022 10:55 AM
Click to return on the top page