Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a veterinary practitioner from performing certain declawing procedures on a cat unless the procedure is necessary for a therapeutic purpose; authorizing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to impose certain disciplinary actions on a veterinary practitioner for willful violations of the prohibition; providing that a violation of the Act is a civil offense; and providing that a person who violates the Act is subject to a fine of up to $1,000.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0022
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253825/1
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-24)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Floor Amendment {843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Senate 2/21/2022 2/16/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-24) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text - Chapter - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
(   10-625.1 )
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page