Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Communications With Public Safety Answering Points
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making communications that are reasonably expected to impair the functioning of a public safety answering point or intended to disrupt an emergency response; prohibiting a person from making a false statement, report, or complaint to a public safety answering point or law enforcement officer that results in a certain response and providing a person who violates the Act is guilty of a felony and on conviction is subject to imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine of up to $25,000, or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0437
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/12/2021
Legislative Date
7/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/12/2021 7/12/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Public Safety - Communications With Public Safety Answering Points
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page