Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Satisfaction of a Mortgage - Required Homeowner's Insurance (Cassidy's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of residential real property in the State that is not subject to a mortgage to maintain homeowner's insurance coverage on the property with liability coverage of at least $100,000 for bodily or personal injury occurring on the property.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0962 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2021
Legislative Date
10/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2021 10/26/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Satisfaction of a Mortgage - Required Homeowner's Insurance (Cassidy's Law)
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   14-133 )
Last Updated: 2/7/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page