Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation, whether or not accurate, does not constitute legally adequate provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter; and establishing that a certain discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation is not a defense to the crime of assault in any degree.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0231
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0554 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/04/2020
Legislative Date
8/04/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/04/2020 8/04/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Mitigation - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {178873/1 Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:07 PM
Click to return on the top page