Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection (Farms Buy Local Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection; and requiring the Task Force to report to the Secretary of Agriculture by December 1, 2023, its recommendations on implementing State meat processing inspection and to advise the Secretary on the adoption of certain rules and regulations related to meat processing inspection and the establishment of production standards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Returning to State Meat Processing Inspection (Farms Buy Local Act)
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page