Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland 3-1-1 Board to establish requirements, procedures, and standards for the establishment of statewide and county 3-1-1 systems; establishing a statewide 3-1-1 system under the Maryland Department of Emergency Management to provide certain nonemergency information, subject to certain requirements; requiring a county to be responsible for certain costs and expenses associated with a county 3-1-1 system; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0138
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0749 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/09/2022
Legislative Date
9/09/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
2 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2023
Legislative Date
1/15/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/09/2022 9/09/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Senate 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment 2 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/15/2023 1/15/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page