Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that equity be considered when State transportation plans, reports, and goals are developed; altering the membership of the advisory committee on State transportation goals, benchmarks, and indicators; requiring the Department of Transportation, in collaboration with the Maryland Transportation Administration, to conduct certain analyses and consult with certain communities before announcing any reduction or cancellation of a certain project in the construction program of the Consolidated Transportation Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0141
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293127/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 41 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-103.1,   7-101,   7-714 through 7-716 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page