Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for the Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program by altering the definitions of "qualified investor" and "qualified Maryland biotechnology company"; providing that the purpose of the program is to foster the growth of Maryland's biotechnology industry; prohibiting the Department of Commerce from issuing any tax credits to certain companies after June 30, 2028; requiring the Department, in consultation with certain experts, to conduct certain studies and report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699830/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {875366/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {699830/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {875366/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page