Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy to review current practices of business entities relating to the collection, use, storage, disclosure, analysis, deletion, and modification of online personal information of consumers in the State; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations, including any recommended legislation, to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Online Consumer Protection and Child Safety Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Online Consumer Protection and Child Safety Act
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983529/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Economic Matters 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/8/2022 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page