Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bailey, Cassilly, Hettleman, Jackson, Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to be the Court Dog Program; expanding the application of the Program to veterans who are participating in a court-supervised, comprehensive, and voluntary treatment-based program; establishing that the Program shall be in the circuit court of each county that participates in the Program and in the District Court of each county that participates in the Program under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0186
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
6/29/2020
Legislative Date
6/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638270/1 Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 6/29/2020 6/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {638270/1 Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts – Court Dog Therapy Program – Veterans Treatment Courts
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text - Chapter - Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:32 PM
Click to return on the top page