Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted by the Department of Juvenile Services governing juvenile care facilities and juvenile detention facilities include the establishment, implementation, and revision of safety plans related to the persons in the care of the facility; requiring residential centers and group homes to establish, implement, and revise a certain safety plan; requiring regulations adopted by the Behavioral Health Administration to include a revision for safety plans not less than every 5 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0297
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2021
Legislative Date
9/18/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2021 9/18/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Safety Plans
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723022/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313227/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Text - Chapter - Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page