Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Theft of Benefits (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to reimburse a beneficiary for any benefits lost due to theft; authorizing certain households to request a certain hearing within 90 days of a certain determination; requiring the State to give preference to certain vendors in the procurement process for electronic benefits distribution or administration; establishing the Benefit Theft Restitution Fund; and requiring the Department to take certain actions to reduce the vulnerability of Electronic Benefits Transfer cards to theft.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0502
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/01/2023
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {673224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Fraud (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2023 2/01/2023 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {673224/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Theft of Benefits (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2023 3/26/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2023 3/26/2023 Hearing canceled
House 3/26/2023 3/26/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-609, 5-610 )
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page