Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a petition for emergency evaluation to be in the form of an electronic record and transmitted and received electronically.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0032
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693020/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (124-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Text - Chapter - Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page