Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson, Guyton, Bagnall, Crosby, Ebersole, Henson, D. Jones, Watson, Bhandari, Jackson, Kerr, Amprey, Anderson, Attar, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Belcastro, C. Branch, T. Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Cardin, Chang, Charles, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, Davis, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Hill, Holmes, Howell, Ivey, A. Jones, R. Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Landis, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Luedtke, McIntosh, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Prettyman, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rogers, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Stein, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, Boteler, Buckel, Griffith, Hartman, Hornberger, Long, and Rose
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for the 30-day period beginning on the effective date of the Act, certain motor fuel taxes that would otherwise be imposed do not apply; requiring the Comptroller to pay a refund advance of motor fuel tax to qualifying retailers under certain circumstances; requiring a qualifying retailer to pay certain motor fuel tax to the Comptroller within 30 days after the expiration of the tax-free period; authorizing the suspension of certain licenses of a qualifying retailer under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1010
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Johnson) Adopted (130-3)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Johnson) Adopted (132-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2022 3/05/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Johnson) Adopted (130-3) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Johnson) Adopted (132-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103623/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 4:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Returned Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Text - Chapter - Motor Fuel Taxes – Tax–Free Period
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page