Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the boundaries of the school board districts for election of the members of the Prince George's County Board of Education.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2022 2/27/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
House 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Board Districts - Redistricting Plan PG 507-22
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page