Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Tax Revenue
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore City, a county, or a municipal corporation to grant the property tax credit to offset increases in local income tax revenues to the owner-occupied property of a homeowner for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022, but before July 1, 2025, whether or not the homeowner has an application for the homestead property tax credit on file with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation, notwithstanding a certain provision of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Tax Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Tax Revenue
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:30 PM
Click to return on the top page