Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court – Concurrent Civil Jurisdiction – Violation of Ordinances
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the District Court has concurrent civil jurisdiction with a governing body of a county or the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore over a proceeding for adjudication of a violation of certain ordinances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - District Court – Concurrent Civil Jurisdiction – Violation of Ordinances
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - District Court – Concurrent Civil Jurisdiction – Violation of Ordinances
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Referred Rules 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text - Chapter - District Court – Concurrent Civil Jurisdiction – Violation of Ordinances
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page