Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Ebersole, Fair, Feldmark, Grossman, Henson, Mireku-North, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Roberts, Vogel, Wells, Wilkins, Wims, Wu, and Young
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering staff qualifications in eligible prekindergarten programs; authorizing a county board to apply for certain funding to lease space to provide prekindergarten programs; establishing an early childhood educator career ladder for eligible private prekindergarten providers; providing for the purpose and structure of the career ladder; requiring the Department of Education to establish prekindergarten provider hubs; requiring the Department to publicize and distribute a certain list of eligible private prekindergarten providers; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-12)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-15)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {743023/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (128-12) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {463720/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (122-15) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 11:14 AM
Click to return on the top page