Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child who is at least 13 years of age alleged to have committed a certain offense; expanding a reporting requirement by the Secretary of Juvenile Services; and expanding a certain provision relating to data collection and analysis by the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
House 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:30 PM
Click to return on the top page