Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee to assist the Department in the development of the Registry, determine what data should be collected and stored along with methods to ensure the privacy and confidentiality of the data, and advise the Department on maintaining of the Registry; and requiring the Department to report by January 1, 2023, to certain committees of the General Assembly on recommendations for the establishment of a Parkinson's Disease Registry.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Parkinson’s Disease Registry – Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823526/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health – Parkinson’s Disease Registry – Established
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823526/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (121-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   18-1201 through 18-1203 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page