Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Fair, Feldmark, Henson, Mireku-North, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Roberts, Vogel, Wells, Wilkins, Wims, and Wu
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, to develop guidelines for an antibias training program for school employees; requiring each county board of education and certain nonpublic schools to offer training based on the guidelines; and providing for the schedule and manner of the training.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - School Employee Anti-Bias Training - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-6)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-11)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Vogel and Wilkins)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Vogel and Wilkins)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Gallion)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Gallion)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {273221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-16)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {273221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Education - Employee Training and Holocaust Education Study - Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {233825/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - School Employee Anti-Bias Training - Requirements
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (128-6) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113824/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-11) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Vogel and Wilkins) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Vogel and Wilkins) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Gallion) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Gallion) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Conference Committee Report {273221/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (120-16) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Conference Committee Report {273221/1 Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements
(   6-129 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page