Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Childhood Exposure to Violence - Health and Social Impacts - Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Prettyman, Anderton, Bagnall, Barve, Boyce, C. Branch, Davis, Foley, Forbes, Griffith, Healey, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Landis, Lehman, Luedtke, McComas, McIntosh, McKay, Patterson, Rosenberg, Smith, Thiam, Wells, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Childhood Exposure to Violence Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup to develop a public awareness and prevention campaign relating to the health and social impacts of children exposed to violence; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations for the public awareness campaign to the Senate Finance and House Health and Government Operations Committees by December 1, 2022.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0764
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Childhood Exposure to Violence - Health and Social Impacts - Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page