Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Full–Time Equivalent Enrollment Count – Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "full-time equivalent enrollment" in the calculation for State education aid to include the average number of students enrolled in kindergarten through grade 12 on September 30, December 31, March 31, and the last day of the prior school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Full–Time Equivalent Enrollment Count – Alterations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page