Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Alteration and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Hinebaugh, Buckel, Jacobs, and Valentine
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of an appropriation the Governor is required to make to the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund, from $1,000,000 each fiscal year to $2,000,000 for fiscal years 2026 and 2027; and extending the termination date applicable to certain provisions relating to the purpose, use, and funding of the Fund, from June 30, 2025, to June 30, 2027.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1094
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0450 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Alteration and Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Alteration and Extension
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
(   2018, 2022 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page