Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Boteler, McComas, and Rose
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law that prohibits a parent or guardian from being required to present a certain certificate of immunization under certain circumstances to be admitted to school to apply only to public schools; requiring the Secretary of Health to include an exclusion for certain individuals when exercising certain authority; and prohibiting an individual from being required to provide certain proof to obtain employment, to travel, or to access a public facility.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1150 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page