Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Amprey, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a major State contractor to file a certain statement with the State Board of Elections if the major State contractor made a certain disbursement during the reporting period to a certain advocacy organization that makes disbursements for public communications relating to a major State project in which the major State contractor has a financial interest; requiring that certain covered disbursements be attributed to a major State contractor; requiring a major State contractor to maintain certain records; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {433128/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (36-90)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433126/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Floor Amendment {433128/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (36-90) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Major State Contractors - Donations to Advocacy Organizations - Disclosure
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:40 PM
Click to return on the top page