Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction - Adults
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over an adult alleged to have willfully contributed to, encouraged, caused or tended to cause any act, omission, or condition which results in a certain violation or renders a child a delinquent child or a child in need of supervision; repealing the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over an adult alleged to have willfully contributed to, encouraged, caused or tended to cause any act, omission, or condition that renders a child in need of assistance; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction - Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction - Adults
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
(   3-610, 3-611 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page