Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Insecurity Zones – State Legislative Districts – Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development and the Department of Planning to jointly produce a report for each State legislative district on the food environment in that district on or before December 1, 2021, and every 2 years thereafter; requiring the reports to include the metrics that determine food insecurity zones; requiring the reports to follow a certain format and be of a certain level of detail; authorizing the departments to collaborate with certain universities and nonprofit organizations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Insecurity Zones – State Legislative Districts – Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Food Insecurity Zones – State Legislative Districts – Reports
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page