Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Terrasa, Acevero, Atterbeary, Boyce, Cain, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Johnson, Korman, McIntosh, and Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a builder of certain new housing units or a builder's agent to provide each buyer or prospective buyer with the option to include on or in a certain garage, carport, or driveway a certain electric vehicle charging station or a dedicated electric line with certain voltage under certain circumstances; requiring a certain builder or builder's agent to give certain buyers and prospective buyers notice of certain options and information about certain rebate programs under certain circumstances; and applying the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180118/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-19)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {180118/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (115-19) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   12-205 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page