Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Recordation of Instrument With False Information - Penalties and Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell and Valentine
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from recording a deed or other instrument that the person knows contains false information; establishing a 3-year limitation on when a prosecution for a violation of the Act may be commenced; establishing a fine not to exceed $500 for a violation of the Act; and authorizing a court to award certain costs and attorney's fees in an action to quiet title if the action or a defense to an action is based on the alleged recordation of a deed containing false information.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0845 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Real Property - Recordation of Instrument With False Information - Penalties and Actions to Quiet Title
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Recordation of Instrument With False Information - Penalties and Actions to Quiet Title
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:18 AM
Click to return on the top page